PA HB155 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 32773, on that portion of U.S. Route 6 over the Tioga River, Mansfield Borough, Tioga County, as the Mansfield Veterans Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 32773, on that portion of U.S. Route 6 over the Tioga River, Mansfield Borough, Tioga County, as the Mansfield Veterans Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 155 PN 120, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-06-16SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-06-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-15HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-14HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-16HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-16HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-16HouseReported as committed
2021-01-13HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback