PA HB1547 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-07 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-07 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further providing for issuance, transfer or extension of hotel, restaurant and club liquor licenses, for the definition of "public venue," for public venue licenses, for court jurisdiction on appeals from decision of the board, for hearings before the board and administrative law judges, for revocation of licenses, for increased fines and for renewal of licenses; and providing for licensees engaged in or allowing other businesses on licensed premises.
Title
Further providing for issuance, transfer or extension of hotel, restaurant and club liquor licenses, for the definition of "public venue," for public venue licenses, for court jurisdiction on appeals from decision of the board, for hearings before the board and administrative law judges, for revocation of licenses, for increased fines and for renewal of licenses; and providing for licensees engaged in or allowing other businesses on licensed premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-07 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-26 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-26 | First consideration | |
2010-05-26 | Reported as amended | |
2009-05-29 | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |