PA HB1543 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 160
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 160
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 17, 2008 (P.L.1645, No.132), known as the Home Improvement Consumer Protection Act, providing for the definition of "time and materials"; and further providing for procedures for registration as a contractor and for home improvement contracts.
Title
Providing for the definition of "time and materials"; and further providing for procedures for registration as a contractor and for home improvement contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-16 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-16 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 160 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (192-0) |
2014-10-08 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-07 | House | In the House |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2014-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2014-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-06-18 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |