PA HB1541 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, providing for special plates for recipients of Air Medal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In registration of vehicles, providing for special plates for recipients of Air Medal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1541 PN 3037, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04291 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2020-02-04SenateIn the Senate
2020-02-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2020-02-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-02-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-02-03HouseSecond consideration
2020-01-22HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-16HouseFirst consideration
2019-12-16HouseReported as amended
2019-06-03HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1541
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1541&pn=1958
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1541&pn=3037
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/16/2019&RollCallId=1488
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/16/2019&RollCallId=1489
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1108
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/04/2020&RollCallId=1721

Bill Comments

feedback