PA HB154 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2003 over the Yellow Breeches Creek, South Middleton Township, Cumberland County, as the Sgt. Adam C. Schoeller Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2003 over the Yellow Breeches Creek, South Middleton Township, Cumberland County, as the Sgt. Adam C. Schoeller Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Rep. Will Tallman [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Stephen Bloom [R] | Rep. Mark Keller [R] |
Rep. Sheryl Delozier [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] | Rep. Tina Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 154 PN 118, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 154 PN 118, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2017-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |