PA HB1536 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege; in rules of the road in general, further providing for the offense of overtaking vehicle on the left and providing for vehicles passing pedestrians on a highway; in special vehicles and pedestrians, further providing for penalty for violation of subchapter; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offense of careless driving.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege; in rules of the road in general, further providing for the offense of overtaking vehicle on the left and providing for vehicles passing pedestrians on a highway; in special vehicles and pedestrians, further providing for penalty for violation of subchapter; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offense of careless driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1536 PN 3206, FP (Y: 191 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1536 PN 2887, 2019 A4382, B. MILLER (Y: 119 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03771 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2020-02-03SenateIn the Senate
2020-02-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-4)
2020-02-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-22HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-01-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-18HouseReported as amended
2019-06-03HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1536
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1536&pn=1954
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1536&pn=2887
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1536&pn=3206
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1353
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1354
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1076
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1093
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/03/2020&RollCallId=1686

Bill Comments

feedback