PA HB1534 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-13 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-13 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in dispositions independent of letters, family exemption, probate of wills and grant of letters, further providing for payments to family and funeral directors.
Title
In dispositions independent of letters, family exemption, probate of wills and grant of letters, further providing for payments to family and funeral directors.
Sponsors
Rep. Milou Mackenzie [R] | Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] |
Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R] | Rep. David Rowe [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1534 PN 1879, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01744 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1534 PN 1879, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01744 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2022-09-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-09-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-28 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-27 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-03 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |