PA HB1533 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for program of accelerated learning following COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
In terms and courses of study, providing for program of accelerated learning following COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01915 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01915 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-03 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |