PA HB1527 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for persons required to report suspected child abuse.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for persons required to report suspected child abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1527 PN 2913, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A05354 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Judiciary: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1527 PN 2913, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A05354 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Judiciary: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2018-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-14 | House | Second consideration |
2018-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2018-01-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-01-23 | House | First consideration |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-11-21 | House | Re-referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |
2017-11-21 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |
2017-06-12 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |