PA HB1527 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for persons required to report suspected child abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In child protective services, further providing for persons required to report suspected child abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1527 PN 2913, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A05354 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Judiciary: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-25SenateSecond consideration
2018-09-24SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-24SenateReported as amended
2018-04-11SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2018-04-09SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2018-04-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-03-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-14HouseSecond consideration
2018-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-23HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-23HouseFirst consideration
2018-01-23HouseReported as amended
2017-11-21HouseRe-referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
2017-11-21HouseReported with request to re-refer to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
2017-06-12HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1527
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1527&pn=1975
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1527&pn=2913
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1527&pn=4055
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1073
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1209
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1210
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1050
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/09/2018&RollCallId=1364
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1078

Bill Comments

feedback