PA HB1523 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in DNA data and testing, further providing for policy, for definitions, for powers and duties of State Police, for State DNA Data Base, for State DNA Data Bank, for State Police recommendation of additional offenses, for procedural compatibility with FBI and for DNA sample required upon conviction, delinquency adjudication and certain ARD cases, providing for collection from persons accepted from other jurisdictions and further providing for procedures for withdrawal, collection and transmission of DNA samples, for procedures for conduct, disposition and use of DNA analysis, for DNA data base exchange and for expungement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In DNA data and testing, further providing for policy, for definitions, for powers and duties of State Police, for State DNA Data Base, for State DNA Data Bank, for State Police recommendation of additional offenses, for procedural compatibility with FBI and for DNA sample required upon conviction, delinquency adjudication and certain ARD cases, providing for collection from persons accepted from other jurisdictions and further providing for procedures for withdrawal, collection and transmission of DNA samples, for procedures for conduct, disposition and use of DNA analysis, for DNA data base exchange and for expungement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1523 PN 2084, FP (Y: 157 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1523 PN 1987, 2017 A1901, DEAN (Y: 79 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1523 PN 1987, 2017 A1900, DEAN (Y: 80 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1523 PN 1987, 2017 A2047, MILLER, D. (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01813 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-20SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-07-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-07-08SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-07-08SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-30SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-30SenateReported as committed
2017-06-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-06-21SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (157-32)
2017-06-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-13HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-13HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-13HouseReported as amended
2017-06-09HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1523
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1523&pn=1958
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1523&pn=1987
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1523&pn=2084
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=575
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/19/2017&RollCallId=673
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=516
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=517
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=518
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=538
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=704
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/30/2017&RollCallId=382
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/08/2017&RollCallId=411

Bill Comments

feedback