PA HB152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in life insurance, further providing for surplus or safety fund and providing for contact information and for life policy locator service; and, in suitability of annuity transactions, further providing for definitions, for applicability and scope of article andfor duties of insurers and insurance producers, providing for insurance producer training, further providing for mitigation of responsibility and for recordkeeping and providing for regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In life insurance, further providing for surplus or safety fund and providing for contact information and for life policy locator service; and, in suitability of annuity transactions, further providing for definitions, for applicability and scope of article andfor duties of insurers and insurance producers, providing for insurance producer training, further providing for mitigation of responsibility and for recordkeeping and providing for regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 3556, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 152 PN 3556, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 399, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 145, 2017 A146, DELUCA (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 145, 2017 A102, ENGLISH (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A00023 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended A00023 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseAct No. 48
2018-06-28HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-06-19HousePresented to the Governor
2018-06-19HouseSigned in Senate
2018-06-18HouseSigned in House
2018-06-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (192-0)
2018-06-18HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-18HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-13HouseIn the House
2018-06-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-11SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-04SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-04SenateSecond consideration
2018-05-23SenateFirst consideration
2018-05-23SenateReported as amended
2017-02-15SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2017-02-08SenateIn the Senate
2017-02-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2017-02-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-02-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-02-07HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-01-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-01-24HouseFirst consideration
2017-01-24HouseReported as amended
2017-01-23HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=152
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0152&pn=0116
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0152&pn=0145
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0152&pn=0399
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0152&pn=3556
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=01/24/2017&RollCallId=2
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=01/24/2017&RollCallId=1
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=22
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=23
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=43
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/08/2017&RollCallId=67
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=05/23/2018&RollCallId=873
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/11/2018&RollCallId=913
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=555
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1328
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=1684

Bill Comments

feedback