PA HB152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in life insurance, further providing for surplus or safety fund and providing for contact information and for life policy locator service; and, in suitability of annuity transactions, further providing for definitions, for applicability and scope of article andfor duties of insurers and insurance producers, providing for insurance producer training, further providing for mitigation of responsibility and for recordkeeping and providing for regulations.
Title
In life insurance, further providing for surplus or safety fund and providing for contact information and for life policy locator service; and, in suitability of annuity transactions, further providing for definitions, for applicability and scope of article andfor duties of insurers and insurance producers, providing for insurance producer training, further providing for mitigation of responsibility and for recordkeeping and providing for regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 3556, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 152 PN 3556, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 399, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 145, 2017 A146, DELUCA (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 145, 2017 A102, ENGLISH (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A00023 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended A00023 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 3556, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 152 PN 3556, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 399, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 145, 2017 A146, DELUCA (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 152 PN 145, 2017 A102, ENGLISH (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A00023 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended A00023 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Act No. 48 |
2018-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-19 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-19 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-18 | House | Signed in House |
2018-06-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (192-0) |
2018-06-18 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-18 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-06-13 | House | In the House |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-05-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2017-02-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-02-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2017-02-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-02-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2017-01-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-01-24 | House | First consideration |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |