PA HB1514 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the Early Childhood Vision Care Education Program and for powers and duties of the Department of Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the Early Childhood Vision Care Education Program and for powers and duties of the Department of Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1514 PN 1939, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-06-13SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2018-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-12HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-05HouseReported as committed
2017-06-07HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1514
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1514&pn=1939
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=1577
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=1633
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1313
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=1663

Bill Comments

feedback