PA HB1511 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in hotel occupancy tax, further providing for definitions and for imposition of tax and establishing the Tourism Promotion Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In hotel occupancy tax, further providing for definitions and for imposition of tax and establishing the Tourism Promotion Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1511 PN 4253, CONCUR (Y: 137 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1511 PN 4253, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1511 PN 3807, FP (Y: 158 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A08095 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24HouseAct No. 109
2018-10-24HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (137-44)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-16HouseIn the House
2018-10-16SenateThird consideration and final passage (43-6)
2018-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-15SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-15SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-10-03SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-03SenateReported as amended
2018-10-02SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2018-10-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (158-26)
2018-10-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-09-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-09-25HouseSecond consideration
2018-09-13HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-22HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-22HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-22HouseReported as amended
2017-06-07HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1511
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1511&pn=1936
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1511&pn=3807
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1511&pn=4149
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1511&pn=4253
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1826
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1828
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1497
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1979
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=10/03/2018&RollCallId=1175
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=706
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=1220
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1627
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/17/2018&RollCallId=2108

Bill Comments

feedback