PA HB1509 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 8A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 8A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Workmen's Compensation Administration Fund to the Department of Labor and Industry and the Department of Community and Economic Development to provide for the expenses of administering the Workers' Compensation Act, The Pennsylvania Occupational Disease Act and the Office of Small Business Advocate for the fiscal year July 1, 2021, to June 30, 2022, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021.
Title
Making appropriations from the Workmen's Compensation Administration Fund to the Department of Labor and Industry and the Department of Community and Economic Development to provide for the expenses of administering the Workers' Compensation Act, The Pennsylvania Occupational Disease Act and the Office of Small Business Advocate for the fiscal year July 1, 2021, to June 30, 2022, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1509 PN 1604, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1509 PN 1604, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1509 PN 1604, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Act No. 8A of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-26 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |