PA HB1507 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-1)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 23, 1970 (P.L.563, No.195), known as the Public Employe Relations Act, defining "political contributions"; further providing for maintenance of membership; and providing for membership dues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defining "political contributions"; further providing for maintenance of membership; and providing for membership dues.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10HouseLaid on the table
2014-09-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2014-06-23HouseRe-committed to RULES
2014-06-23HouseFirst consideration
2014-06-23HouseReported as amended
2013-06-10HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback