PA HB1502 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 72 (Taxation and Fiscal Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for financial transparency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for financial transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1502 PN 1879, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateReferred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-27SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-11HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-05HouseReported as committed
2019-05-22HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1502
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1502&pn=1879
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=631
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=697
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=609
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=982

Bill Comments

feedback