PA HB150 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-07 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-07 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8391, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 53 over Laurel Run, also known as Lost Creek, in Dean Township, Cambria County, as the Seaman 2nd Class Louis J. Benzie WWII Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8391, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 53 over Laurel Run, also known as Lost Creek, in Dean Township, Cambria County, as the Seaman 2nd Class Louis J. Benzie WWII Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 150 PN 115, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 150 PN 115, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-26 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-03 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-02-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-02-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |