PA HB1495 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in professional employees, further providing for causes for suspension, for persons to be suspended and for appeals to superintendent of public instruction; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In professional employees, further providing for causes for suspension, for persons to be suspended and for appeals to superintendent of public instruction; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-19HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-19HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-19HouseReported as committed
2017-06-05HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback