PA HB1490 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-21 - Act No. 65
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rates and distribution systems, further providing for rates to be just and reasonable; and providing for water and sewer authorities in cities of the second class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rates and distribution systems, further providing for rates to be just and reasonable; and providing for water and sewer authorities in cities of the second class.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1490 PN 2650, CONCUR (Y: 189 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1490 PN 2650, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1490 PN 1909, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended A01598 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01598 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-21HouseAct No. 65
2017-12-21HouseApproved by the Governor
2017-12-11HousePresented to the Governor
2017-12-11HouseSigned in Senate
2017-11-20HouseSigned in House
2017-11-20HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (189-5)
2017-11-20HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-10-25HouseReferred to RULES
2017-10-25HouseIn the House
2017-10-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-10-25SenateAmended on third consideration
2017-10-02SenateRemoved from table
2017-09-19SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-06-30SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-06-29SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-29SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-28SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-28SenateReported as amended
2017-06-12SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-06-08SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2017-06-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-07HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-05HouseReported as amended
2017-06-02HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1490
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1490&pn=1896
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1490&pn=1909
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1490&pn=2163
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1490&pn=2650
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=06/05/2017&RollCallId=473
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=06/05/2017&RollCallId=474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/07/2017&RollCallId=537
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=452
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=06/28/2017&RollCallId=364
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/30/2017&RollCallId=394
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=327
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=827
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1084

Bill Comments

feedback