PA HB1488 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of October 9, 2008 (P.L.1438, No.118), known as the Massage Therapy Law, further providing for powers and duties of board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for powers and duties of board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-17HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-12HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-12HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-12HouseReported as committed
2017-06-02HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback