PA HB1486 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of October 4, 1978 (P.L.864, No.167), known as the Storm Water Management Act, further providing for definitions and for effect of watershed storm water plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions and for effect of watershed storm water plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1486 PN 1893, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1486 PN 1893, FP (Y: 156 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateAct No. 15
2018-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-04-09SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-04-09SenateSigned in House
2018-03-26SenateSigned in Senate
2018-03-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-03-20SenateSecond consideration
2018-01-30SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-30SenateReported as committed
2017-11-01SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2017-10-17SenateIn the Senate
2017-10-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (156-33)
2017-10-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-10-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-16HouseSecond consideration
2017-10-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-03HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-03HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-03HouseReported as committed
2017-06-02HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1486
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1486&pn=1893
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=10/03/2017&RollCallId=935
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=754
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/17/2017&RollCallId=1010
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=9&theDate=01/30/2018&RollCallId=644
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=437

Bill Comments

feedback