PA HB1484 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 30, 1987 (P.L.375, No.75), entitled, "An act providing for the designation of certain trees and land on the grounds of the State Capitol in Harrisburg as "Soldiers' Grove" in honor of war veterans; imposing duties upon the Department of General Services; and making an appropriation," further providing for duties of Department of General Services and for appropriation; and providing for preservation of "Soldiers' Grove" and for construction.
Title
Amending the act of October 30, 1987 (P.L.375, No.75), entitled, "An act providing for the designation of certain trees and land on the grounds of the State Capitol in Harrisburg as "Soldiers' Grove" in honor of war veterans; imposing duties upon the Department of General Services; and making an appropriation," further providing for duties of Department of General Services and for appropriation; and providing for preservation of "Soldiers' Grove" and for construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1484 PN 3338, CONCUR (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1484 PN 3338, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1484 PN 2097, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1484 PN 3338, CONCUR (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1484 PN 3338, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1484 PN 2097, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | House | Act No. 38 |
2016-06-08 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-01 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-05-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-05-24 | House | Signed in House |
2016-05-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (189-0) |
2016-05-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-05-18 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-05-17 | House | In the House |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-11-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-11-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-11-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-19 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-17 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-08-10 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |