PA HB148 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in penalties, further prohibiting duress and intimidation of voters and interference with the free exercise of the elective franchise.
Title
In penalties, further prohibiting duress and intimidation of voters and interference with the free exercise of the elective franchise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-21 | House | Second consideration |
2016-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |