PA HB1479 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Act No. 7 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Act No. 7 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 31 from Strikertown Road to Renaissance Lane in South Huntingdon Township, Westmoreland County, as the John Michael Beyrand Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 31 from Strikertown Road to Renaissance Lane in South Huntingdon Township, Westmoreland County, as the John Michael Beyrand Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1479 PN 1598, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1479 PN 1598, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1479 PN 1598, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Act No. 7 of 2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-24 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |