PA HB1479 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of August 15, 1961 (P.L.987, No.442), known as the Pennsylvania Prevailing Wage Act, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A01774 (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-20 - House - House State Government: Report for purpose of re-ferral to Education Committee (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-20 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01774 (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-20HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-20HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-20HouseReported as amended
2017-06-06HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1479
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1479&pn=1917
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1479&pn=2082
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/20/2017&RollCallId=675
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/20/2017&RollCallId=676
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/20/2017&RollCallId=674

Bill Comments

feedback