PA HB1477 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-9)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in tobacco products tax, further providing for definitions, for incidence and rate of tax; and providing for vapor products tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In tobacco products tax, further providing for definitions, for incidence and rate of tax; and providing for vapor products tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Finance: Amendment Failed A02476 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-29HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-29HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-29HouseReported as committed
2017-06-01HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback