PA HB1471 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-09 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-09 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as the Second Class County Code, in special powers and duties of the county, further providing for flags to decorate graves.
Title
In special powers and duties of the county, further providing for flags to decorate graves.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1471 PN 4081, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1471 PN 1876, 2017 A9362, CHRISTIANA (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1471 PN 4081, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1471 PN 1876, 2017 A9362, CHRISTIANA (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-09 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2018-10-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (184-0) |
2018-10-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-09-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-09-13 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |