PA HB1470 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code, in special powers and duties of counties, further providing for flags to decorate graves.
Title
In special powers and duties of counties, further providing for flags to decorate graves.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |