PA HB1469 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement.
Title
In adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1469 PN 4299, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1469 PN 3795, A10411, BLAKE AMENDMENT NO. A-10411 (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2186, FP (Y: 107 N: 87 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2016, 2017 A1999, MOT RECON, HARPER (Y: 87 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2016, 2017 A2371, HARPER (Y: 133 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2016, 2017 A1999, EVANKOVICH (Y: 101 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2016, 2017 A1999, MOT RECON, EVANKOVICH (Y: 119 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2016, 2017 A1999, EVANKOVICH (Y: 94 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01827 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1469 PN 3795, A10411, BLAKE AMENDMENT NO. A-10411 (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2186, FP (Y: 107 N: 87 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2016, 2017 A1999, MOT RECON, HARPER (Y: 87 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2016, 2017 A2371, HARPER (Y: 133 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2016, 2017 A1999, EVANKOVICH (Y: 101 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2016, 2017 A1999, MOT RECON, EVANKOVICH (Y: 119 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1469 PN 2016, 2017 A1999, EVANKOVICH (Y: 94 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01827 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-17 | House | In the House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (31-18) |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (45-4) |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2017-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (107-87) |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-28 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |