PA HB1460 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-01 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-01 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 24 (Education) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes as follows: In Title 24: for retirement for school employees, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in membership, contributions and benefits, providing for nonparticipatory employer withdraw liability and further providing for actuarial cost method; in School Employees' Defined Contribution Plan, further providing for vesting; and, in administration and miscellaneous provisions, further providing for administrative duties of board, for payments to school entities by Commonwealth commencing with the 2019-2020 school year and providing for delinquent payments. In Title 71: for retirement for State employees and officers, in membership, credited service, classes of service and eligibility for benefits regarding administration of the State Employees' Retirement Fund, further providing for election to become a Class A-6 member or solely a participant in the plan and for eligibility for death benefits; in benefits, further providing for maximum single life annuity; and, in administration of funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the board.
Title
Amending Titles 24 (Education) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes as follows: In Title 24: for retirement for school employees, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in membership, contributions and benefits, providing for nonparticipatory employer withdraw liability and further providing for actuarial cost method; in School Employees' Defined Contribution Plan, further providing for vesting; and, in administration and miscellaneous provisions, further providing for administrative duties of board, for payments to school entities by Commonwealth commencing with the 2019-2020 school year and providing for delinquent payments. In Title 71: for retirement for State employees and officers, in membership, credited service, classes of service and eligibility for benefits regarding administration of the State Employees' Retirement Fund, further providing for election to become a Class A-6 member or solely a participant in the plan and for eligibility for death benefits; in benefits, further providing for maximum single life annuity; and, in administration of funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1460 PN 2810, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05216 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1460 PN 2595, 2017 A4830, RYAN (Y: 146 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03865 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1460 PN 2810, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05216 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1460 PN 2595, 2017 A4830, RYAN (Y: 146 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03865 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2017-12-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-12-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2017-12-12 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2017-12-11 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-11-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-11-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-17 | House | First consideration |
2017-10-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |