PA HB1459 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-09 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-09 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 23, 1931 (P.L.932, No.317), known as The Third Class City Code, in civil service, further providing for promotions.
Title
In civil service, further providing for promotions.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Creighton [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] |
Rep. Timothy Briggs [D] | Sen. Steven Santarsiero [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-10-26 - Senate - HB 1459 PN 1765, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-24 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - HB 1459 PN 1765, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-10-24 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - HB 1459 PN 1765, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-09 | Senate | Act No. 99 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2011-10-31 | Senate | Signed in House |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-05-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-05-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2011-05-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2011-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-10 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-05-04 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |