PA HB1457 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, further providing for mastectomy and breast cancer reconstruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In casualty insurance, further providing for mastectomy and breast cancer reconstruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1457 PN 1825, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1457 PN 1825, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateAct No. 44
2020-07-01SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-06-29SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-06-29SenateSigned in Senate
2020-06-24SenateSigned in House
2020-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-06-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-22SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-10SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-10SenateReported as committed
2019-11-21SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2019-11-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-11-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-11-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-30HouseSecond consideration
2019-10-29HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-17HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-17HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-17HouseReported as committed
2019-05-14HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1457
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1457&pn=1825
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=06/17/2019&RollCallId=761
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=846
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1373
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/10/2020&RollCallId=961
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=1011
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=550

Bill Comments 750

feedback