PA HB1452 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-06 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-06 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 19, 1931 (P.L.589, No.202), referred to as the Barbers' License Law, further providing for definitions.
Title
Further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1452 PN 2143, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02223 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1452 PN 2143, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02223 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2017-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-28 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |