PA HB1450 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 23, 2002 (P.L.298, No.39), known as the Main Street Act, further providing for the duration of grants.
Title
Further providing for the duration of grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |