PA HB1446 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, providing for extended special education enrollment due to COVID-19.
Title
In pupils and attendance, providing for extended special education enrollment due to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01932 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01932 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |