PA HB144 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1990 (P.L.1200, No.202), known as the Solicitation of Funds for Charitable Purposes Act, further providing for exemptions from registration.
Title
Further providing for exemptions from registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Floor: HB 144 PN 108, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Floor: HB 144 PN 108, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2017-04-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-19 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-18 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-05 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to FINANCE |