PA HB1437 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in city revitalization and improvement zones, further providing for reports and for restrictions; and, in rural jobs and investment tax credit, further providing for definitions, for rural growth funds, for tax credit certificates, for claiming the tax credit and for revocation of tax credit certificates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In city revitalization and improvement zones, further providing for reports and for restrictions; and, in rural jobs and investment tax credit, further providing for definitions, for rural growth funds, for tax credit certificates, for claiming the tax credit and for revocation of tax credit certificates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1437 PN 4124, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1437 PN 4124, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1437 PN 1775, FP (Y: 159 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23HouseAct No. 68
2020-07-23HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-07-15HousePresented to the Governor
2020-07-15HouseSigned in Senate
2020-07-14HouseSigned in House
2020-07-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2020-07-14HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-07-14HouseReferred to RULES
2020-07-14HouseIn the House
2020-07-14SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-07-14SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-07-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-07-13SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-06-23SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-23SenateReported as amended
2019-06-14SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-06-11SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (159-41)
2019-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-15HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-15HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-15HouseReported as committed
2019-05-08HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1437
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1437&pn=1775
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1437&pn=4007
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1437&pn=4124
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=05/15/2019&RollCallId=574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=386
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=719
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=999
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1534
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=600
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/14/2020&RollCallId=1068
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=07/14/2020&RollCallId=2365

Bill Comments

feedback