PA HB1436 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-12 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-12 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rates and distribution systems, providing for computation of income tax expense for ratemaking purposes.
Title
In rates and distribution systems, providing for computation of income tax expense for ratemaking purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1436 PN 2690, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1436 PN 2690, FP (Y: 155 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-12-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05407 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05407 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1436 PN 2690, FP (Y: 155 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-12-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05407 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-19 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05407 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-12 | Senate | Act No. 40 |
2016-06-12 | Senate | Became Law without Governor's signature |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-04-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2016-02-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-02-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (155-41) |
2016-02-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-01-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-01-27 | House | Second consideration |
2016-01-26 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-19 | House | First consideration |
2015-12-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-07-06 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |