PA HB1429 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in theft and related offenses, providing for the offense of financial exploitation of an older adult or care-dependent person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In theft and related offenses, providing for the offense of financial exploitation of an older adult or care-dependent person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1429 PN 1902, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1429 PN 1902, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1429 PN 1702, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01404 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseAct No. 48
2021-06-30HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25HouseSigned in Senate
2021-06-25HouseSigned in House
2021-06-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2021-06-25HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-06-25HouseReferred to RULES
2021-06-25HouseIn the House
2021-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-1)
2021-06-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-06-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-24SenateSecond consideration
2021-06-23SenateFirst consideration
2021-06-23SenateReported as amended
2021-06-17SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-06-15SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-06-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-14HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-09HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-07HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-07HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-07HouseReported as amended
2021-05-17HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1429
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1429&pn=1545
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1429&pn=1702
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1429&pn=1902
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1429P1702.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB1429P1902.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1429P1902.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=06/07/2021&RollCallId=528
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=06/07/2021&RollCallId=529
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=338
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/15/2021&RollCallId=649
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/23/2021&RollCallId=421
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/24/2021&RollCallId=441
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=459
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=789
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=247

Bill Comments 750

feedback