PA HB1426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Act No. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Act No. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in size, weight and load, further providing for conditions of permits and security for damages, for permit for movement of construction equipment and for permit for movement of containerized cargo.
Title
In size, weight and load, further providing for conditions of permits and security for damages, for permit for movement of construction equipment and for permit for movement of containerized cargo.
Sponsors
Rep. Melinda Fee [R] | Rep. Thomas Sankey [R] | Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] | Rep. David Hickernell [R] |
Rep. Steven Mentzer [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Bryan Barbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1426 PN 1794, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1426 PN 1794, FP (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1426 PN 1794, FP (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Act No. 24 |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-07-09 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-07-09 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (39-10) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-1) |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-26 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |