PA HB1419 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-12)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in criminal history record information, further providing for general regulations and for order for limited access and providing for clean slate limited access, for exceptions, for order to vacate order for limited access, for effects of expunged records and records subject to limited access and for employer immunity from liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In criminal history record information, further providing for general regulations and for order for limited access and providing for clean slate limited access, for exceptions, for order to vacate order for limited access, for effects of expunged records and records subject to limited access and for employer immunity from liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1419 PN 3314, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3314, FP (Y: 188 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3166, 2017 A6244, HARRIS, J. (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3166, 2017 A6295, DELOZIER (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3166, 2017 A6263, DELOZIER (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05937 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateAct No. 56
2018-06-28SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-06-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-06-22SenateSigned in Senate
2018-06-22SenateSigned in House
2018-06-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-18SenateReported as committed
2018-04-16SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-04-11SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-2)
2018-04-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-03-14HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-13HouseReported as amended
2017-05-25HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1419
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1419&pn=1847
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1419&pn=3166
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1419&pn=3314
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1305
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1307
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1077
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1078
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1079
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/11/2018&RollCallId=1404
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1096
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=973
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=996
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=616

Bill Comments

feedback