PA HB1419 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-12)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-12)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in criminal history record information, further providing for general regulations and for order for limited access and providing for clean slate limited access, for exceptions, for order to vacate order for limited access, for effects of expunged records and records subject to limited access and for employer immunity from liability.
Title
In criminal history record information, further providing for general regulations and for order for limited access and providing for clean slate limited access, for exceptions, for order to vacate order for limited access, for effects of expunged records and records subject to limited access and for employer immunity from liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1419 PN 3314, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3314, FP (Y: 188 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3166, 2017 A6244, HARRIS, J. (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3166, 2017 A6295, DELOZIER (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3166, 2017 A6263, DELOZIER (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05937 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3314, FP (Y: 188 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3166, 2017 A6244, HARRIS, J. (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3166, 2017 A6295, DELOZIER (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1419 PN 3166, 2017 A6263, DELOZIER (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05937 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 56 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-2) |
2018-04-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |