PA HB1416 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-8)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions.
Title
In corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A09252 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A09252 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-30 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-30 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-26 | House | Referred to FINANCE |