PA HB1414 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in other required equipment, further providing for visual and audible signals on emergency vehicles and for visual signals on authorized vehicles and providing for flashing or revolving yellow and white lights and for solid waste collection vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in other required equipment, further providing for visual and audible signals on emergency vehicles and for visual signals on authorized vehicles and providing for flashing or revolving yellow and white lights and for solid waste collection vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1414 PN 2920, FP (Y: 185 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1414 PN 2799, 2017 A5344, MARSHALL (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03840 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-16SenateSecond consideration
2018-03-26SenateFirst consideration
2018-03-26SenateReported as amended
2018-01-26SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-24SenateIn the Senate
2018-01-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (185-2)
2018-01-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-01-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-23HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-12-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-11HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-11HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-11HouseReported as amended
2017-05-19HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1414
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1414&pn=1779
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1414&pn=2799
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1414&pn=2920
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1414&pn=3204
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1155
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1154
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=970
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1229
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=986
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=03/26/2018&RollCallId=724

Bill Comments

feedback