PA HB1412 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Re-committed to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in restructuring of electric utility industry, providing for microgrid and energy storage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In restructuring of electric utility industry, providing for microgrid and energy storage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A05878 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A05878 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HouseRe-committed to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2018-03-14HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-12HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-12HouseReported as amended
2017-05-19HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback