PA HB1410 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 63 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 63 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Weigh Station Preclearance Program; and providing for criteria for preclearance system and devices and for data access.
Title
Establishing the Weigh Station Preclearance Program; and providing for criteria for preclearance system and devices and for data access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1410 PN 2613, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 2613, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03433 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 1883, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01854 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1410 PN 2613, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 2613, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03433 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 1883, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01854 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Act No. 63 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-08 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-07 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-1) |
2022-07-07 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-07-07 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-07-07 | House | In the House |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-09-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2021-09-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-27 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |