PA HB141 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in talent recruitment, further providing for Talent Recruitment Account; and establishing the Grow-Your-Own Educators Grant Program and grow-your-own educator career pathways; and imposing duties of the Department of Education.
Title
In talent recruitment, further providing for Talent Recruitment Account; and establishing the Grow-Your-Own Educators Grant Program and grow-your-own educator career pathways; and imposing duties of the Department of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 966, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 120 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00273 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 966, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 120 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00273 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2023-05-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-05-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (120-81) |
2023-05-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-04-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-04-26 | House | Second consideration |
2023-04-25 | House | Removed from table |
2023-04-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-04-24 | House | First consideration |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |