PA HB141 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, in subdivision and land development, providing for nonbuilding lots.
Title
In subdivision and land development, providing for nonbuilding lots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 107, FP (Y: 111 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 107, 2021 A1055, FREEMAN (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 107, 2021 A1054, FREEMAN (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 107, 2021 A1009, FREEMAN (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 107, 2021 A978, FREEMAN (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00912 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00921 (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 107, 2021 A1055, FREEMAN (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 107, 2021 A1054, FREEMAN (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 107, 2021 A1009, FREEMAN (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 141 PN 107, 2021 A978, FREEMAN (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00912 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00921 (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-05-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-05-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (111-90) |
2021-05-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-25 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-05 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |